Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Jardine, Kurt, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Schechter, Richard M., against Kemper, Donnie J, Moody International Inc, represented by Taylor, Robin Kathleen, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 164th with MICHAEL LANDRUM presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMICHAEL LANDRUM Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 10, 2000 |
CategoryPersonal Inj (Non-Auto) |
Last RefreshedNovember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court House164th |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Non-Suit Signed |
Plaintiffs original petition
Date: July 25, 2008Defendants, Donnie J. Kemper and Moody International, Inc. original answer
Date: September 16, 2008ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE
Date: February 03, 2010Civil process request
Date: July 25, 2008docket control order
Date: January 08, 2009Defendants, Donnie J Kemper and Moody International,Inc.'s Designation of Expert Witnesses
Date: December 14, 2009Filing letter
Date: June 17, 2009Agreement for ADR
Date: October 12, 2009order resetting trial
Date: February 09, 2010ORDER OF NON-SUIT SIGNED
Date: May 17, 2010Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 31, 2010 |
Trial on Merits Trial Setting |
||
May 17, 2010 | EACH PAY OWN | ||
May 17, 2010 | ORDER OF NONSUIT SIGNED(Final Order) | ||
May 17, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDER OF NON-SUIT SIGNED | |
May 11, 2010 | Docket Event | Motion for non-suit of Defendants Donnie J. Kemper and Moody International, Inc. | |
March 17, 2010 | Docket Event | Deposition Subpoena to Testify or Produce Documents or Things | |
March 17, 2010 | Docket Event | Production of Certified Copy | |
March 17, 2010 | Docket Event | Officers 203 Certification of Deposition Upon Written Questions | |
March 03, 2010 | Docket Event | Deposition Subpoena to Testify or Produce Documents or Things | |
March 03, 2010 | Docket Event | Officers 203 Certification of Deposition Upon Written Questions |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.