Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Purnell, Rosie B, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Jonte, Christine K., against Purnell, Rosie, Purnell, J T, represented by Cole, Richard M., in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 308th with GLORIA LOPEZ presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGLORIA LOPEZ Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2000 |
CategoryFocas - Divorce W/ Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House308th |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment, Order Signed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 01, 2014 | NO COSTS ALLOCATED | ||
December 01, 2014 | NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, FINAL (TRCP 162) (FAMILY) (Final Order) | ||
December 01, 2014 | Docket Event | NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, FINAL (TRCP 162) (FAMILY) | |
November 20, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
November 20, 2014 | Docket Event | PROPOSED ORDER ON MOTION TO NONSUIT | |
October 14, 2014 |
Trial on Merits Family Trial Docket NON SUIT_112015 |
||
September 09, 2014 |
Trial on Merits Family Trial Docket RULE 11 AGREEMENT |
||
September 08, 2014 | Docket Event | RULE 11 AGREEMENT | |
August 27, 2013 |
Trial on Merits Family Trial Docket PER JDG/DKT |
||
August 27, 2013 |
COMPEL ANS TO INTERROGS - MTN (TRCP 168) Show Cause Docket (Family) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.