Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Yuen, Jason, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Lindsey-Pottinger, Allecia, against City Of Houston, represented by Leguizamon, Jaqueline I, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 281st with CHRISTINE WEEMS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCHRISTINE WEEMS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2007 |
CategoryDamages (Oth) |
Last RefreshedNovember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court House281st |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Non-Suit Signed |
civil process request
Date: December 31, 2007original answer & special exceptions
Date: February 18, 2008plea to the jurisdiction
Date: February 18, 2008proposed order granting special exceptions
Date: February 18, 2008proposed order granting plea to the jurisdiction
Date: February 18, 2008ORDER OF NON-SUIT SIGNED
Date: March 18, 2008supplement to its plea to the jurisdiction
Date: February 20, 2008Plaintiffs Motion for Non-Suit
Date: March 06, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 18, 2008 | Docket Event | ORDER OF NON-SUIT SIGNED | |
March 18, 2008 | PLAINTIFF COSTS | ||
March 18, 2008 | ORDER OF NONSUIT SIGNED(Final Order) | ||
March 07, 2008 |
STIPULATION Law Day Docket PER KIMBERLY 3/7 8:17A |
||
March 06, 2008 | Docket Event | Plaintiffs Motion for Non-Suit | |
March 06, 2008 | Docket Event | Receipt | |
February 20, 2008 | Docket Event | supplement to its plea to the jurisdiction | |
February 20, 2008 | Docket Event | notice of hearing | |
February 20, 2008 | Docket Event | supplement to its special exception | |
February 18, 2008 | Docket Event | original answer & special exceptions |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.