Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Imeogu, Roeline, Imeogu, Roseline, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Sherman, Muakum J., against Lee, Dorsey E, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 308th with SANDRA PEAKE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2006 |
CategoryDivorce |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House308th |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed For Want Of Prosecution |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 06, 2007 | EACH PAY OWN | ||
November 06, 2007 | DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION (Final Order) | ||
November 06, 2007 | Docket Event | DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION | |
November 05, 2007 |
Trial on Merits Family Trial Docket |
||
November 01, 2007 | FIRST AMENDED ANSWER ATTORNEY AD LITEM | ||
July 19, 2007 | ANSWER ATTORNEY AD LITEM | ||
July 09, 2007 | ORDER TO APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM GRANTED (Temporary Order) | ||
July 09, 2007 |
Trial on Merits Family Trial Docket |
||
July 09, 2007 | Docket Event | ORDER TO APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM GRANTED | |
March 23, 2007 | ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTED SERVICE SIGNED (Temporary Order) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.