Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Gugel, Christina Begeron, Gugel, Kerry L, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Bryant, Deborah E., against Richmond Bone & Joint Clinic P A, Richmond Bone & Joint Surgical Pllc, Richmond Surgical Pllc, Wasserman, Matthew W, represented by Prewett, Matthew Miles, Williamson, Holly Harvel, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 151st with MIKE ENGELHART presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2006 |
CategoryAssault - Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedNovember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court House151st |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Non-Suit Signed |
PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: December 29, 2006CIVIL PROCESS REQUEST FORM
Date: December 29, 2006DEFENDANTS ORIGINAL ANSWER
Date: January 22, 2007DEFENDANTS RICHMOND BONE & JOINT CLINIC, P.A. AND RICHMOND SURGICAL, PLLCS ORIGINAL ANSWER
Date: January 23, 2007DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED
Date: February 08, 2007DEFENDANTS JOINT MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM AND FOR PROTECTION
Date: May 15, 2007PROPOSED ORDER
Date: May 15, 2007PROPOSED ORDER
Date: May 29, 2007PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR NON-SUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Date: June 05, 2007ORDER OF NON-SUIT SIGNED
Date: June 07, 2007Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 19, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address | |
February 18, 2008 |
Trial on Merits Trial Setting NONSUIT |
||
August 07, 2007 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION | |
July 06, 2007 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION | |
June 07, 2007 | NO COSTS ALLOCATED | ||
June 07, 2007 | ORDER OF NONSUIT SIGNED(Final Order) | ||
June 07, 2007 | Docket Event | ORDER OF NON-SUIT SIGNED | |
June 05, 2007 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR NON-SUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
June 05, 2007 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION | |
May 30, 2007 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.