Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Field Copy & Printing Of Texas Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Rhodes, Eric Lamont, against Collins, John, represented by Washington, Tyrone William, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 281st with CHRISTINE WEEMS presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2006 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedNovember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House281st |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed For Want Of Prosecution |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: December 29, 2006DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED
Date: May 21, 2007CIVIL PROCESS REQUEST FORM
Date: March 27, 2007DEFENDANT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER
Date: April 16, 2007DOCKET CONTROL ORDER
Date: June 25, 2007Notice of Intent to Dismiss- Bankruptcy
Date: April 07, 2008DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: August 25, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 25, 2008 | PLAINTIFF COSTS | ||
August 25, 2008 | DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION (Final Order) | ||
August 25, 2008 | Docket Event | DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION | |
May 09, 2008 |
DISMISS FOR WANT OF PROSECU-MTN TO (TRCP 165A) Trial Coordinators Docket |
||
April 07, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of Intent to Dismiss- Bankruptcy | |
March 03, 2008 |
Trial on Merits Trial Setting BANKRUPTCY |
||
June 25, 2007 | Docket Event | DOCKET CONTROL ORDER | |
June 14, 2007 | Docket Event | certificate of written discovery | |
May 21, 2007 | Docket Event | DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED | |
May 21, 2007 | DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED (Temporary Order) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.