Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
As The Property Owners, Katy Ft Bend Houston Aip, filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Mckenney, Hugh L., against Appraisal Review Board Of Harris County Appraisal District, Harris County Appraisal District, represented by Robinson, James D., in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 125th with KYLE CARTER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKYLE CARTER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 16, 2004 |
CategoryAppeal Appraisal Board |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
Filing Court House125th |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Non-Suit Signed |
DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED
Date: January 23, 2006MOTION
Date:ORDER SIGNED COMPELLING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: March 24, 2006MOTION
Date: April 07, 2006MOTION
Date: May 13, 2006ORDERS
Date: May 18, 2006ORDER OF NON-SUIT SIGNED
Date: May 30, 2006Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 19, 2006 |
Trial on Merits Trial Setting CASE DISPOSED |
||
June 09, 2006 |
DOCKET CALL Trial Coordinators Docket |
||
May 30, 2006 | NO COSTS ALLOCATED | ||
May 30, 2006 | ORDER OF NONSUIT SIGNED(Final Order) | ||
May 30, 2006 | Docket Event | ORDER OF NON-SUIT SIGNED | |
May 22, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICES | |
May 18, 2006 | Docket Event | ORDERS | |
May 13, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICES | |
May 13, 2006 | Docket Event | MOTION | |
May 10, 2006 | Docket Event | X-CASEFILE DOCUMENTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.