Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Suntree Realty Partners L P, filed a(n) Deceptive Trade Practices - Consumer case represented by Wilshire, Eugene B. Jr., against Goldsmith, Alan, Hamilton, John, Kilgore, Joe, Mason Road Trust, represented by Caplan, Andrew M., in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 129th with MICHAEL GOMEZ presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 02, 2003 |
CategoryDtpa-Deceptive Trade Practice |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaConsumer |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeDeceptive Trade Practices |
Filing Court House129th |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed For Want Of Prosecution |
PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: November 14, 2005MEMORANDUM
Date: November 14, 2005DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED
Date: February 14, 2006ORDER SIGNED GRANTING REFERRAL TO MEDIATION
Date: January 10, 2007RULE 11 AGREEMENT
Date: December 12, 2006AGREED MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE
Date: January 19, 2007ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE
Date: January 22, 2007ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL
Date: January 25, 2007ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL
Date: June 12, 2007AGREED MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE AND FOR ENTRY OF A NEW DOCKET CONTROL ORDER
Date: August 10, 2007DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED
Date: August 15, 2007ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE
Date: August 15, 2007ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL
Date: March 24, 2008RULE 11 AGREEMENT
Date: May 20, 2008ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE
Date: March 24, 2008MEDIATOR REPORT
Date: June 12, 2008ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL
Date: June 13, 2008Agreed Motion for Continuace
Date: October 20, 2008RULE 11 AGREEMENT
Date: July 09, 2008ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE
Date: October 21, 2008ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL
Date: October 22, 2008Amended agreed motion for continuance
Date: April 30, 2009ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE
Date: May 05, 2009ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL
Date: May 06, 2009Trial preparation order
Date: September 10, 2009Amended Agreed Motion for Continuance
Date: November 19, 2009Proposed order
Date: November 19, 2009ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE
Date: November 23, 2009ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL
Date: December 02, 2009Trial preparation order
Date: February 12, 2010Proposed order
Date: March 29, 2010Agreed Motion for Continuance
Date: March 29, 2010ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE
Date: March 30, 2010Notice of Intent to Dismiss- Bankruptcy
Date: October 06, 2010Notice of Intent to Dismiss - Bankruptcy
Date: February 10, 2012ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL
Date: April 07, 2010DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: March 27, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 27, 2012 | PLAINTIFF COSTS | ||
March 27, 2012 | DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION (Final Order) | ||
March 27, 2012 | Docket Event | DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION | |
March 19, 2012 |
DISMISS FOR WANT OF PROSECU-MTN TO (TRCP 165A) Trial Coordinators Docket |
||
February 10, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice of Intent to Dismiss - Bankruptcy | |
November 08, 2010 |
Trial on Merits Trial Setting BANKRUPTCY |
||
November 01, 2010 |
DISMISS FOR WANT OF PROSECU-MTN TO (TRCP 165A) Trial Coordinators Docket |
||
November 01, 2010 |
PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE (NO TCR) Trial Coordinators Docket BANKRUPTCY |
||
October 06, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice of Intent to Dismiss- Bankruptcy | |
August 16, 2010 | BANKRUPTCY PROCEEDINGS, CASE ON HOLD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.