Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
City Of Houston, Harris County, Harris County Education Department, Harris County Flood Control District, Harris County Hospital District, (total of 8) See All filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Linebarger, Goggan Blair & Sampson, against Any And All Persons Owning Having Or Claiming Any Interest Or Lien, Burns, Jan Rayburn, Manteris, James S Jr, Rayburn, Jan, Rayburn, Jan J, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 165th with URSULA A. HALL presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeURSULA A. HALL Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 16, 2004 |
CategoryTax Suit |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Filing Court House165th |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed For Want Of Prosecution |
DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: August 28, 2007PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED PETITION
Date: March 20, 2007PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: October 23, 2005LETTER
Date: March 20, 2007NOTICE OF ORDER DISMISSING CASE FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: September 27, 2007Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 27, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ORDER DISMISSING CASE FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION | |
August 28, 2007 | NO COSTS ALLOCATED | ||
August 28, 2007 | DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION (Final Order) | ||
August 28, 2007 | Docket Event | DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION | |
August 10, 2007 |
Trial on Merits Tax Docket (Trial) PTM 8/10/07 |
||
July 05, 2007 |
DISMISS FOR WANT OF PROSECU-MTN TO (TRCP 165A) Tax Docket (Trial) |
||
June 29, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TRIAL | |
June 28, 2007 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
June 13, 2007 | Docket Event | DWOP FOR 2007 | |
March 20, 2007 | FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.