Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
City Of Houston, Harris County, Harris County Education Department, Harris County Flood Control District, Harris County Hospital District, (total of 8) See All filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Linebarger, Goggan Blair & Sampson, against Any And All Persons Owning Having Or Claiming Any Interest Or Lien, Bank Of Houston, Elbar Investments Inc, Honomichi, Miles, Honomichl, Miles, (total of 12) See All represented by Chmielowiec, Susan, Farley, Billy Jack, Hippard,Claude Daniel, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 333rd with DARYL L. MOORE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDARYL L. MOORE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 16, 2004 |
CategoryTax Suit |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Filing Court House333rd |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed For Want Of Prosecution |
PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: October 23, 2005ORIGINAL ANSWER OF ELBAR INVESTMENTS, INC.
Date: December 13, 2005ANSWER OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Date: April 26, 2006ORIGINAL ANSWER
Date: December 27, 2006LETTER REGARDING CITATIONS
Date: April 11, 2007DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: April 07, 2008NOTICE OF DISMISSAL
Date: June 08, 2007Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 09, 2008 | Docket Event | DWOP FOR SPRING 2008 | |
April 07, 2008 | NO COSTS ALLOCATED | ||
April 07, 2008 | DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION (Final Order) | ||
April 07, 2008 | Docket Event | DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION | |
March 04, 2008 |
DISMISS FOR WANT OF PROSECU-MTN TO (TRCP 165A) Tax Docket (Trial) |
||
February 01, 2008 | Docket Event | DWOP FOR SPRING OF 2008 | |
November 06, 2007 |
DISMISS FOR WANT OF PROSECU-MTN TO (TRCP 165A) Tax Docket (Trial) |
||
July 03, 2007 |
DISMISS FOR WANT OF PROSECU-MTN TO (TRCP 165A) Tax Docket (Trial) |
||
June 29, 2007 | Docket Event | CITATION | |
June 26, 2007 | Docket Event | CITATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.