Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bailey, James Michael, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Baughman, Bruce A., against Bailey, Charlotte Marie, represented by Hale, Frank Allen, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 310th with SONYA HEATH presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2004 |
CategoryDivorce |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House310th |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment, Order Signed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2018 | E-DOCS MAILED | ||
March 20, 2006 |
Trial on Merits Family Trial Docket PROVE-UP ON 2/27 |
||
March 14, 2006 | EACH PAY OWN | ||
March 14, 2006 | AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED(Final Order) | ||
March 14, 2006 | Docket Event | AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED | |
March 13, 2006 |
ENTRY OF JUDGMENT Show Cause Docket (Family) |
||
March 06, 2006 |
ENTRY OF JUDGMENT Show Cause Docket (Family) ATTY AGREE |
||
February 27, 2006 | TO TRIAL ON MERITS (NON JURY) | ||
February 27, 2006 | EVIDENCE PRESENTED-NON JURY (EACH DAY) | ||
February 27, 2006 | SETTLED/NON-SUITED (NON-JURY) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.