Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Martin, Frederick, Martin, Melayne, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Bradt, L. T., Teltschik, Corwin L., against Bohls, Aaron, Whanger, Jeffrey, represented by Blute, Peter, Salinger, Jana O., in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 189th with SCOT DOLLINGER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 06, 2005 |
CategoryDamages (Oth) |
Last RefreshedNovember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court House189th |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment Signed For Defendant (Non-Jury) |
civil process request
Date: May 11, 2005Letter dated may 9, 2006
Date: May 09, 2005Defendants original answer
Date: June 27, 2005letter dated june 22, 2005
Date: June 27, 2005Letter dated july 22, 2005
Date: July 22, 2005Defendants original answer
Date: June 16, 2005Letter dated june 27, 2005
Date: June 28, 2005Letter dated july 22, 2005
Date: July 25, 2005Letter dated january 17, 2006
Date: January 18, 2006Defendants motion to compel responses to request for production and interrogatories
Date: January 18, 2006Melayne martins response to defendant jefferey whangers request for admission
Date: January 18, 2006Proposed order granting defendants motion to compel
Date: January 27, 2006Plaintiffs first amended original petition
Date: June 05, 2006court confirmation letter
Date: April 24, 2006Letter dated may 31, 2007
Date: June 07, 2007Docket control order
Date: June 08, 2006Defendants first amended answer
Date: February 23, 2006Defendants first amended original answer
Date: June 05, 2006Defendant bohls first motion to compel
Date: May 09, 2006Signed order of referral for mediation
Date: June 07, 2006Defendants second amended answer
Date: June 05, 2006Letter dated june 5, 2006
Date: June 05, 2006Letter dated may 4, 2006
Date: May 08, 2006Letter dated may 26, 2006
Date: June 01, 2006Letter dated may 19, 2006
Date: May 19, 2006ORDER SIGNED GRANTING SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS
Date: June 08, 2006Letter dated july 24, 2006
Date: July 27, 2006Motion to substitute counsel
Date: August 16, 2006Defendant jefferey whangers motion to dismiss
Date: August 29, 2006Plaintiffs first amended original petition
Date: June 12, 2006Letter dated august 7, 2006
Date: August 16, 2006letter dated october 25, 2006
Date: August 16, 2006letter dated august 29, 2006
Date: August 29, 2006Letter dated june 2, 2006
Date: June 15, 2006Letter dated august 23, 2006
Date: August 24, 2006Proposed order granting defendant, jeffery whanger motion to dismiss
Date: August 29, 2006Defendants second amended original answer
Date: September 01, 2006Plaintiffs first amended response to request for rule 194 disclosures
Date: September 07, 2006ORDER SIGNED DENYING MOTION T0 DISMISS
Date: September 07, 2006Plaintiff frederick martins first amended designation of expert witnesses
Date: November 22, 2006Rule 11 agreement
Date: December 18, 2006Proposed order
Date: January 05, 2007Agreed motion for continuance and request for new docket control order
Date: January 05, 20072007 attorney vacation schedule request
Date: May 15, 2007Melatne martins first amended answers to defendant jefferey whangers interrogatories
Date: September 07, 2006Plaintiffs motion for continuance and request for new docker control order
Date: September 01, 2006Proposed order
Date: September 07, 2006Defendant, aaron bohls motion for continuance
Date: September 07, 2006Plaintiffs motion for continuance and request for new docket control order
Date: September 07, 2006Letter dated october 16, 2007
Date: October 26, 2007Plaintiffs response to defendant jefrey whangers motion to dismiss
Date: September 07, 2006Docket control order
Date: September 08, 2006ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD
Date: November 06, 2006Letter dated January 3, 2008
Date: January 07, 2008Docket control order
Date: January 09, 2007Rule 11 Agreement
Date: June 09, 2009Notice of mediation
Date: June 07, 2007ORDER SIGNED GRANTING REFERRAL TO MEDIATION
Date: June 07, 2007Motion for continuance and request for new docket control order
Date: February 15, 2008Letter dated october 30, 2007
Date: October 30, 2007Agreed motion for continuance
Date: October 30, 2007Letter dated november 6, 2007
Date: November 12, 2007ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE
Date: November 01, 2007Letter datd april 15, 2008
Date: April 16, 2008Order resetting trial
Date: December 21, 2007Letter dated january 17, 2008
Date: January 22, 2008Plaintiffs third amended original petition and first amended original answer to counterclaim
Date: January 22, 2008Subpoena for witness pursuant to texas rules of civil procedure 176
Date: February 13, 2008Docket control order
Date: February 18, 2008letter dated march 13, 2008
Date: March 14, 2008Defendant, aaron bohls first amended original answer
Date: March 14, 2008Letter dated february 8, 2008
Date: April 21, 2008Letter dated may 21, 2008
Date: May 23, 2008counter-defendants original answer
Date: May 23, 2008Order resetting trial
Date: July 17, 2008motion for continuance
Date: October 06, 2008Letter - (Teltchik Associates)
Date: October 20, 2008Docket Control Order
Date: October 22, 2008proposed order
Date: January 22, 2009Letter 1-20-09
Date: January 22, 2009plaintiffs fourth Amended original Petition and second amended original Answer to counterclaim
Date: February 02, 2009plaintiff response to defendant's motion to compel and special exceptions
Date: February 06, 2009ORDER SIGNED GRANTING SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS
Date: February 11, 2009Letter
Date: February 24, 2009Motion for Continuance
Date: February 19, 2009defendant, aaron bohl's second amended original answer
Date: February 17, 2009richard alford, m.d.'s and michael steines, m.d.'s motion for protection and to quash subpoena
Date: February 24, 2009motion for protection, motion to quash and objections to subpoena
Date: February 25, 2009plaintiffs' motion for directed verdict as to defendant, jeffrey whanger's counterclaim
Date: February 26, 2009Notice of intent to dismiss for failure to submit final judgment
Date: April 01, 2009Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 09, 2009 | Docket Event | Rule 11 Agreement | |
June 09, 2009 | Docket Event | Cover Letter | |
May 06, 2009 | DEFENDANT COSTS | ||
May 06, 2009 | FINAL JUDGMENT SIGNED FOR DEFENDANT (NON-JURY) (Final Order) | ||
May 06, 2009 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT SIGNED FOR DEFENDANT (NON-JURY) | |
May 01, 2009 |
DISMISS FOR WANT OF PROSECU-MTN TO (TRCP 165A) Another Docket 5/6/09 FINAL JUDGMT |
||
April 01, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice of intent to dismiss for failure to submit final judgment | |
February 27, 2009 | Docket Event | charge of the court | |
February 26, 2009 | EVIDENCE PRESENTED JURY TRIAL (EACH DAY) | ||
February 26, 2009 | ORDER SIGNED DENYING ENTRY OF TEMPORARY ORDERS (Temporary Order) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.