Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Botero, Luz Margarita, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Perry, Cornelius D., against Torres, Ricardo Arzayus, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 312th with CLINTON WELLS presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 02, 2003 |
CategoryDivorce |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House312th |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 09, 2013 | Docket Event | Receipt | |
March 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Capias Family | |
April 20, 2012 | Docket Event | Receipt | |
October 18, 2011 | Docket Event | Signed Order Concerning Community Supervision | |
October 18, 2011 | Docket Event | Respondents Original Answer | |
August 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Affidavit Pursuant To Texas Family Code 157 163 | |
July 08, 2011 | Docket Event | Citation/Precept | |
July 05, 2011 | Docket Event | Signed Order to Appeara And Show cause | |
July 05, 2011 | Docket Event | Citation/Precept/Motion To Revoke Community Supervision/Exhibit A/Exhibit B | |
July 05, 2011 | Docket Event | Precept |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.