Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
City Of Houston, Harris County, Houston Community College System, Houston Independent School District, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Linebarger, Goggan Blair & Sampson, against Block, A F, Sykes, D S, Tippett, J B, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 189th with SCOT DOLLINGER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 15, 2003 |
CategoryTax Suit |
Last RefreshedNovember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Filing Court House189th |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment Signed For Plaintiff (Non-Jury) |
MOTION
Date: February 28, 2005ORDERS
Date: March 09, 2006ORDER TO APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM GRANTED
Date: July 18, 2005ORDER OF SALE IN TAX SUITS THE STATE OF TEXAS
Date: October 06, 2006ORDER GRANTING STATEMENT OF EVIDENCE SIGNED
Date: March 20, 2006Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 06, 2006 | Docket Event | ORDER OF SALE IN TAX SUITS THE STATE OF TEXAS | |
March 20, 2006 | FEE AWARDED TO ATTORNEY AD LITEM(Temporary Order) | ||
March 20, 2006 | ORDER GRANTING STATEMENT OF EVIDENCE SIGNED (Temporary Order) | ||
March 20, 2006 | MULTIPLE PARTIES OR EXCEPTION | ||
March 20, 2006 | FINAL JUDGMENT SIGNED FOR PLAINTIFF (NON-JURY) (Final Order) | ||
March 20, 2006 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING STATEMENT OF EVIDENCE SIGNED | |
March 20, 2006 | Docket Event | FEE AWARDED TO ATTORNEY AD LITEM | |
March 20, 2006 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT SIGNED FOR PLAINTIFF (NON-JURY) | |
March 09, 2006 | TO TRIAL ON MERITS (NON JURY) | ||
March 09, 2006 | EVIDENCE PRESENTED-NON JURY (EACH DAY) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.