Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Small-Chevalier, Cheryl, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Chevalier, Jason, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 309th with LINDA MARIE DUNSON presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 13, 2004 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House309th |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment Signed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 07, 2018 |
ENFORCE DECREE ( MOTION TO) Domestic Relation Docket |
||
June 23, 2018 | DEFENDANT COSTS | ||
June 23, 2018 | JUDGMENT FOR PAST-DUE CHILD SUPPORT PAYMENTS (Final Order) | ||
June 23, 2018 | ORDER SUSPENDING COMMITMENT GRANTED(Temporary Order) | ||
June 23, 2018 | Docket Event | SENSITIVE DATA DOCUMENT | |
June 15, 2018 |
ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (MOTION FOR) Contempt Docket (Family) |
||
June 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Concerning Community Supervision | |
June 13, 2018 |
ENFORCE DECREE ( MOTION TO) Contempt Docket (Family) |
||
April 23, 2018 | ORDER OF RELEASE FROM JAIL SIGNED (Temporary Order) | ||
April 23, 2018 | ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING(Temporary Order) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.