Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ewan, Heather Elaine, Ewan-Varholak, Heather Elaine, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Christopher, Heather, Varholak, Michael Thomas, Ewan, Heather, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 311th with LINDA MARIE DUNSON presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 09, 2003 |
CategoryDivorce |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House311th |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Order Of Contempt Signed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 07, 2009 | Docket Event | Administrative Writ of Withholding - Electronically filed by A.G. | |
February 11, 2009 | Docket Event | Administrative Writ of Withholding - Electronically filed by A.G. | |
October 30, 2008 | CHG VENUE/JURISD.RETURN RCPT REC | ||
October 21, 2008 | CHG VENUE/JURISD. DOCS.MAILED | ||
September 22, 2008 |
TRIAL ON MERITS (MOTION FOR) Family Trial Docket |
||
July 23, 2008 | DEFENDANT COSTS | ||
July 23, 2008 | ORD SGN-TRANSFER TO ANOTHER COUNTY/JURISDICTION (Final Order) | ||
July 23, 2008 | PLAINTIFF COSTS | ||
July 23, 2008 | Docket Event | ORD SGN-TRANSFER TO ANOTHER COUNTY/JURISDICTION | |
July 17, 2008 |
ENFORCE DECREE ( MOTION TO) Contempt Docket (Family) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.