Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Attorney General Child Support Enforcement Division, Amos, Ericka L, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Ag Child Support, 602, against Amos-Steward, Ericka, Baker, Kevin B, Amos, Ericka L, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 312th with CLINTON WELLS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCLINTON WELLS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 01, 2000 |
CategoryTitle-4 Support |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Filing Court House312th |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 23, 2009 |
TRIAL ON MERITS (MOTION FOR) Family Trial Docket |
||
November 11, 2008 | CHG VENUE/JURISD.RETURN RCPT REC | ||
November 06, 2008 | CHG VENUE/JURISD. DOCS.MAILED | ||
October 13, 2008 | ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION SIGNED (Temporary Order) | ||
October 13, 2008 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION SIGNED | |
October 08, 2008 |
TEMPORARY INJUNCTION (MOTION FOR) Show Cause Docket (Family) S/B TRANSFERED |
||
October 07, 2008 | PLAINTIFF COSTS | ||
October 07, 2008 | ORD SGN-TRANSFER TO ANOTHER COUNTY/JURISDICTION (Final Order) | ||
October 07, 2008 | Docket Event | ORD SGN-TRANSFER TO ANOTHER COUNTY/JURISDICTION | |
September 24, 2008 |
TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER (MOTION FOR) Show Cause Docket (Family) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.