Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Tharbs, Topeka Jeanine, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Chan, David, against Tharbs, Boba Jr, Hicks, Topeka, Tharbs, Boba, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 308th with GLORIA LOPEZ presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 22, 1996 |
CategoryDivorce |
Last RefreshedMarch 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House308th |
Case Outcome TypeMotion Granted By Agreement Of Parties |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 2021 |
MOTION FOR SUPPORT Title IV-D Trial Docket |
||
December 01, 2020 |
MOTION FOR PREFERENTIAL SETTING Title IV-D Trial Docket |
||
July 10, 2020 |
MOTION FOR PREFERENTIAL SETTING Title IV-D Trial Docket RESET |
||
May 29, 2020 |
MOTION FOR PREFERENTIAL SETTING Title IV-D Trial Docket RESET |
||
May 11, 2020 | IV-D MASTER SIGNED ORDER SETTING HEARING (Temporary Order) | ||
May 11, 2020 | Docket Event | SENSITIVE DATA DOCUMENT | |
April 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Setting Hearing | |
April 16, 2020 | IV-D MASTER SIGNED ORDER SETTING HEARING (Temporary Order) | ||
April 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Setting Hearing | |
April 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Issuance of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.