Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Armstrong, Kimberly Ann, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Lucille Forrest, against Armstrong, Elgin Bruce, in the jurisdiction of Guadalupe County, TX, . Guadalupe County, TX Superior Courts with Steel, Gary Converted Disposition:Party: ARMSTRONG, ELGIN BRUCE Disposition: *Final-Non-Jury presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 21, 1999 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 29, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGuadalupe County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Request
Judge: Steel, Gary Converted Disposition:Party: ARMSTRONG, ELGIN BRUCE Disposition: *Final-Non-Jury |
|
August 14, 2002 | Docket Event |
Correspondence
Judge: Steel, Gary Converted Disposition:Party: ARMSTRONG, ELGIN BRUCE Disposition: *Final-Non-Jury |
|
July 10, 2001 | Docket Event |
Correspondence
Judge: Steel, Gary Converted Disposition:Party: ARMSTRONG, ELGIN BRUCE Disposition: *Final-Non-Jury |
|
March 02, 2001 | Docket Event |
Correspondence
Judge: Steel, Gary Converted Disposition:Party: ARMSTRONG, ELGIN BRUCE Disposition: *Final-Non-Jury |
|
December 18, 2000 | Docket Event |
Correspondence
Judge: Steel, Gary Converted Disposition:Party: ARMSTRONG, ELGIN BRUCE Disposition: *Final-Non-Jury |
|
June 16, 2000 | Docket Event |
Correspondence
Judge: Steel, Gary Converted Disposition:Party: ARMSTRONG, ELGIN BRUCE Disposition: *Final-Non-Jury |
|
May 17, 2000 | Docket Event |
Correspondence
Judge: Steel, Gary Converted Disposition:Party: ARMSTRONG, ELGIN BRUCE Disposition: *Final-Non-Jury |
|
May 11, 2000 | Docket Event |
Correspondence
Judge: Steel, Gary Converted Disposition:Party: ARMSTRONG, ELGIN BRUCE Disposition: *Final-Non-Jury |
|
April 12, 2000 | Docket Event |
Comment (Judicial Officer: Steel, Gary )
Judge: Steel, Gary Converted Disposition:Party: ARMSTRONG, ELGIN BRUCE Disposition: *Final-Non-Jury |
|
April 12, 2000 | Docket Event |
Certificate
Judge: Steel, Gary Converted Disposition:Party: ARMSTRONG, ELGIN BRUCE Disposition: *Final-Non-Jury |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.