Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Villela, Danny, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Carley Fisher, John Arthur Daspit, against Wuest'S Inc., in the jurisdiction of Guadalupe County, TX, . Guadalupe County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 27, 2024 |
CategoryDamage - Other Than Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedMarch 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationGuadalupe County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event | Citation Returned Served | |
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event | Citation Wuest's Inc. Served 02/29/2024 Returned 03/01/2024 | |
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event | Citation Wuest's Inc. Unserved | |
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Request for Issuance Request for Issuance |
|
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) | |
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.