Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Ramirez, Melissa, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Bryan D Pope, J. Scott Mechler, against Peterson, Jeremy Clinton, Peterson, Mathia Rene, represented by Edward J Batis, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Guadalupe County, TX, . Guadalupe County, TX Superior Courts with Heather H. Wright presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 29, 2021 |
CategoryDamages - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedSeptember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationGuadalupe County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Agreed Resolution CANCELED Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wright, Heather) Agreed Resolution |
|
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Announcement Agreed Resolution CANCELED Announcement (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wright, Heather) Agreed Resolution |
|
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Delivery | |
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Delivery | |
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Delivery | |
June 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Designation | |
June 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Delivery | |
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Rule 11 Agreement | |
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Delivery | |
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Intention |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.