Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
San Marcos Consolidated Independent School District, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Sam Turner, against Finlay, Halleyanna, Finlay, James Sterling, in the jurisdiction of Guadalupe County, TX, . Guadalupe County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 28, 2021 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedSeptember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationGuadalupe County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Returned Served | |
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Returned Served | |
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Issued | |
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Finlay, James Sterling Served 11/30/2021 Returned 12/02/2021 Finlay, Halleyanna Served 10/26/2021 Returned 11/03/2021 | |
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Intervention | |
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.