Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Voss Farms Homeowners Association, Inc., filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by William D. Crist, against Sheppard, Constance D., Unknown Occupant, in the jurisdiction of Guadalupe County, TX, . Guadalupe County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 27, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property |
Last RefreshedSeptember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationGuadalupe County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Returned Unserved | |
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Returned Served | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Sheppard, Constance D. Served 11/12/2021 Returned 11/15/2021 UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S) Returned Unserved 12/27/2021 Returned 12/27/2021 | |
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Process | |
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Amended Petition | |
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Process | |
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Application Filed (OCA) | |
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.