Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) Other Civil Cases-Nisi case represented by Steven Tays, against Banker'S Insurance Co., Guardiola, Mary Victoria, in the jurisdiction of Guadalupe County, TX, . Guadalupe County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 15, 2021 |
CategoryOther Civil Cases-Nisi |
Last RefreshedSeptember 26, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationGuadalupe County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeDismissed By Plaintiff |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Steel, Gary |
|
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Receipt
Judge: Steel, Gary |
|
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Correspondence
Judge: Steel, Gary |
|
October 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned Served
Judge: Steel, Gary |
|
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation GUARDIOLA, MARY VICTORIA Served 09/22/2021 Returned 09/22/2021 BANKER'S INSURANCE CO. Served 10/01/2021 Returned 10/11/2021
Judge: Steel, Gary |
|
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned Served
Judge: Steel, Gary |
|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request to Issue Citation
Judge: Steel, Gary |
|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judgment NISI (OCA-Civil)
Judge: Steel, Gary |
|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Steel, Gary |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.