Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
The County Of Guadalupe, Texas, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Matthew Tepper, against Crayton, Delissa Navonne, Crayton, Jacquelyne, represented by Hunter H. Hewell, in the jurisdiction of Guadalupe County, TX, . Guadalupe County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 16, 2021 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedSeptember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationGuadalupe County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Correspondence
Judge: Old III, William D |
|
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Correspondence
Judge: Old III, William D |
|
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Receipt
Judge: Old III, William D |
|
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Receipt
Judge: Old III, William D |
|
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice
Judge: Old III, William D |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Receipt
Judge: Old III, William D |
|
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Sheriff Sale
Judge: Old III, William D |
|
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Affidavit
Judge: Old III, William D |
|
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice
Judge: Old III, William D |
|
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Sale
Judge: Old III, William D |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.