Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
The County Of Guadalupe, Texas, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Matthew Tepper, against Santillan, Salomon, in the jurisdiction of Guadalupe County, TX, . Guadalupe County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 15, 2021 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedSeptember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationGuadalupe County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment/Order - 306a Sent
Judge: Old III, William D |
|
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Judgment
Judge: Old III, William D |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Last Known Address
Judge: Old III, William D |
|
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned Served
Judge: Old III, William D |
|
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued
Judge: Old III, William D |
|
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Santillan, Salomon Served 10/20/2021 Returned 10/21/2021
Judge: Old III, William D |
|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Old III, William D |
|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA)
Judge: Old III, William D |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.