Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Guadalupe County, TX, . Guadalupe County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2021 |
CategoryNotice Of Seizure And Intended Forfeiture |
Last RefreshedSeptember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationGuadalupe County, TX |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Correspondence
Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
April 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Last Known Address
Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
April 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Servicemembers Civil Relief Act Affidavit
Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
April 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment (OCA)
Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned Served
Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued
Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request
Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Goodman, Edward Ray Unserved
Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned Unserved
Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA)
Judge: Wright, Heather |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.