Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Balvin, Stephanie April, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Guzman, Gerardo, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Guadalupe County, TX, . Guadalupe County, TX Superior Courts with Wright, Heather presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 14, 2021 |
CategoryParent-Child Relationship - No Divorce |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGuadalupe County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wright, Heather)
Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Affidavit
Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Completion
Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Last Known Address
Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Set
Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Return of Service
Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Process
Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued
Judge: Wright, Heather |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.