Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Edmondson, Trevor Lewis, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Edmondson, Leah Christy, in the jurisdiction of Guadalupe County, TX, . Guadalupe County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 14, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGuadalupe County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Rule 11 Agreement | |
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Answer | |
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Designation | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Amended Petition | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Process | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Issued | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation EDMONDSON, LEAH CHRISTY Unserved | |
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition for Divorce |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.