Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Rodriguez, Malachi Max, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Venegas, Jasmine Lynn, in the jurisdiction of Guadalupe County, TX, . Guadalupe County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 12, 2021 |
CategoryParent-Child Relationship - No Divorce |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGuadalupe County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing-Temporary Orders (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wright, Heather) | |
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Counter-Petition | |
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Answer | |
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Return of Service | |
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation VENEGAS, JASMINE LYNN Served 05/27/2021 Returned 05/28/2021 | |
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Issued | |
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Precept VENEGAS, JASMINE LYNN Served 05/27/2021 Returned 05/28/2021 | |
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Precept Issued | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Process | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition (Non-OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.