Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Citibank, N.A., filed a(n) Promissory Note - Creditor case represented by Shawn R. Redman, Timothy L. Elder, against Drake, Annette, Drake, Annette B, in the jurisdiction of Guadalupe County, TX, . Guadalupe County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 04, 2021 |
CategoryAccounts, Contracts & Notes |
Last RefreshedSeptember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationGuadalupe County, TX |
Matter TypePromissory Note |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Designation | |
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Response | |
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Returned Served | |
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Issued | |
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation DRAKE, ANNETTE B Served 05/07/2021 Returned 05/10/2021 | |
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) | |
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Process |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.