Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rodriguez, Maurilio, filed a(n) Other Complaint (Not Spec) Unlimited (42) case against $17,118.00 U.S. Currency, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Francisca P. Tisher presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 11, 2009 |
CategoryOther Complaint (Not Spec) Unlimited (42) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions62 days |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time104 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Conference: Status 245110-Conference: Status; The People of the State of CA vs. $17118.00 U.S. Currency ; Judge: J21195 Stone Rodney Judge: Stone, Rodney |
|
August 12, 2009 | Docket Event |
Other MINUTE ORDER ; ; ; ; |
|
August 12, 2009 | Docket Event |
Judgment 226110-Judgment Filed/Issued By: JUDGMENT [226110] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
August 12, 2009 | Docket Event |
Converted Stat Closure Disposition Date: Aug 12 2009 Type: 244710 - Judgment: Court Finding Manner : 251110 - After Court Trial |
|
August 12, 2009 | Docket Event |
Other Hearing 216910-Hearing: Other; The People of the State of CA vs. $17118.00 U.S. Currency ; Judge: J21195 Stone Rodney Additional Info : stipulation re: currency forfeiture Judge: Stone, Rodney |
|
August 12, 2009 | Docket Event |
Minute Order 213610-Minute Order Filed/Issued By: MINUTE ORDER [213610] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
August 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
Conference: Status 245110-Conference: Status; The People of the State of CA vs. $17118.00 U.S. Currency ; Judge: J21160 Tisher Francisca P. Judge: Tisher, Francisca P. |
|
August 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
Minute Order 213610-Minute Order Filed/Issued By: MINUTE ORDER [213610] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
July 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
Petition Filed 212110-Petition Filed/Issued By: 931220 - Attorney for Petitioner PETITION [212110] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PETITIONER [931220] |
|
June 11, 2009 | Docket Event |
Documents Prior to 5-17-05 MINUTE ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.