Case Last Refreshed: 1 hour ago
Rothrock, Shelby, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Rothrock, James, in the jurisdiction of Guadalupe County, TX, . Guadalupe County, TX Superior Courts 2nd 25th District Court with Jessica Richard Crawford presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJessica Richard Crawford Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedApril 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGuadalupe County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House2nd 25th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Crawford, Jessica) motion to ign temporary orders motion to ign temporary orders |
|
April 29, 2024 | Docket Event | Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Crawford, Jessica) | |
April 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice Proposed Jury Instructions Proposed Jury Instructions |
|
April 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Agreement Respondent's Proposed Parenting Plan Respondent's Proposed Parenting Plan |
|
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event | Request for Copies | |
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event | Announcement (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Crawford, Jessica) | |
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion Petitioner's Shelby Rothrock's Motion in Limine Petitioner's Shelby Rothrock's Motion in Limine |
|
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion MOITON IN LIMINE MOITON IN LIMINE |
|
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order to be Signed by Judge ORDER ON MOTION IN LIMINE ORDER ON MOTION IN LIMINE |
|
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Vacation Letter |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.