Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Attorney General Of Texas filed a(n) General Family - Family case in the jurisdiction of Guadalupe County, TX, . Guadalupe County, TX Superior Courts with Harris, Susan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2010 |
CategoryAll Other Family Matters - Ag |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGuadalupe County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Case Outcome TypeAll Other Dispositions |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Harris, Susan |
|
April 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Harris, Susan |
|
March 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Harris, Susan |
|
March 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
Paternity Results
Judge: Harris, Susan |
|
February 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Harris, Susan |
|
January 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Precept
Judge: Harris, Susan |
|
January 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Citation
Judge: Harris, Susan |
|
December 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA)
Judge: Harris, Susan |
|
December 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Harris, Susan |
|
December 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Harris, Susan |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.