Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Attorney General Of Texas filed a(n) General Family - Family case in the jurisdiction of Guadalupe County, TX, . Guadalupe County, TX Superior Courts with Vickers, Joe presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2010 |
CategoryAll Other Family Matters - Ag |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGuadalupe County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Case Outcome TypeAll Other Dispositions |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Fax Transmittal
Judge: Vickers, Joe |
|
November 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
Correspondence
Judge: Vickers, Joe |
|
November 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Supplemental Order/Notice to Withhold Income
Judge: Vickers, Joe |
|
October 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
Correspondence
Judge: Vickers, Joe |
|
May 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
Correspondence
Judge: Vickers, Joe |
|
April 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Vickers, Joe |
|
May 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Vickers, Joe |
|
April 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Certificate
Judge: Vickers, Joe |
|
April 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Vickers, Joe |
|
March 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
Paternity Results
Judge: Vickers, Joe |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.