Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Guadalupe, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Shelburne J. Veselka, against Herrera, Soila, Herrera, Ramiro, Herrera, Maria Guadalupe, Herrera, Manuel, Jr., Herrera, Lenore Ontiveros, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Guadalupe County, TX, . Guadalupe County, TX Superior Courts with Old III, William D presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2010 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationGuadalupe County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Receipt
Judge: Old III, William D |
|
November 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
Certified Tax Affidavit
Judge: Old III, William D |
|
November 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Last Known Address
Judge: Old III, William D |
|
November 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
Judgment
Judge: Old III, William D |
|
October 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Trial
Judge: Old III, William D |
|
September 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Trial
Judge: Old III, William D |
|
April 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
Citation HERRERA, MARIA GUADALUPE Unserved
Judge: Old III, William D |
|
April 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
Copy(s)
Judge: Old III, William D |
|
February 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Citation
Judge: Old III, William D |
|
January 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Citation HERRERA, MARIA GUADALUPE Returned Unserved 02/26/2013 Returned 02/26/2013
Judge: Old III, William D |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.