Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Guadalupe, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Shelburne J. Veselka, against Gonzales, Gerald S, Gonzales, Cheryle H., in the jurisdiction of Guadalupe County, TX, . Guadalupe County, TX Superior Courts with Peschel, Dwight presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2010 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationGuadalupe County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed By Plaintiff |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
Return
Judge: Peschel, Dwight |
|
July 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal
Judge: Peschel, Dwight |
|
July 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice
Judge: Peschel, Dwight |
|
April 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Citation
Judge: Peschel, Dwight |
|
March 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
Citation GONZALES, GERALD S Served 03/23/2011 Returned 04/01/2011 GONZALES, CHERYLE H. Served 03/23/2011 Returned 04/01/2011
Judge: Peschel, Dwight |
|
January 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
Citation
Judge: Peschel, Dwight |
|
January 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
Citation
Judge: Peschel, Dwight |
|
December 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
Citation GONZALES, GERALD S Returned Unserved 01/25/2011 Returned 01/25/2011 GONZALES, CHERYLE H. Returned Unserved 01/25/2011 Returned 01/25/2011 VANDERBILT MORTGAGE & FINANCE, INC. Served 12/31/2010 Returned 01/12/2011
Judge: Peschel, Dwight |
|
December 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA)
Judge: Peschel, Dwight |
|
December 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
Comment
Judge: Peschel, Dwight |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.