Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gonzales, Henry, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Medellin, Dawn Marie, in the jurisdiction of Guadalupe County, TX, . Guadalupe County, TX Superior Courts with Jones, Linda Z presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2010 |
CategoryAll Other Family Matters |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGuadalupe County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Case Outcome TypeAll Other Dispositions |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Change of Address
Judge: Jones, Linda Z |
|
May 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion to Withdrawal (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Jones, Linda Z)
Judge: Jones, Linda Z |
|
May 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Jones, Linda Z |
|
April 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion
Judge: Jones, Linda Z |
|
April 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice
Judge: Jones, Linda Z |
|
April 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Request
Judge: Jones, Linda Z |
|
April 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion
Judge: Jones, Linda Z |
|
February 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
Return
Judge: Jones, Linda Z |
|
February 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Jones, Linda Z)
Judge: Jones, Linda Z |
|
February 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Jones, Linda Z |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.