Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sanchez, Humberto, Sanchez, Alice, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Sanchez, Shirley, in the jurisdiction of Guadalupe County, TX, . Guadalupe County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 10, 2010 |
CategoryAll Other Family Matters |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGuadalupe County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 27, 2011 | Docket Event | Hearing-Temporary Orders (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Jones, Linda Z) | |
January 24, 2011 | Docket Event | Answer | |
January 12, 2011 | Docket Event | Order | |
January 12, 2011 | Docket Event | Motion | |
January 03, 2011 | Docket Event | Citation | |
December 17, 2010 | Docket Event | Citation Sanchez, Shirley Served 12/27/2010 | |
December 14, 2010 | Docket Event | Comment | |
December 10, 2010 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) | |
December 10, 2010 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.