Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Promissory Note - Creditor case represented by Michael J. Scott, against Kern, Malory, Garcia, Eulogia, in the jurisdiction of Guadalupe County, TX, . Guadalupe County, TX Superior Courts with Kirkendall, W.C. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2010 |
CategoryAccounts, Contracts & Notes |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationGuadalupe County, TX |
Matter TypePromissory Note |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Kirkendall, W.C. |
|
July 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment (OCA)
Judge: Kirkendall, W.C. |
|
July 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion
Judge: Kirkendall, W.C. |
|
July 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
Certificate
Judge: Kirkendall, W.C. |
|
July 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice
Judge: Kirkendall, W.C. |
|
January 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Citation
Judge: Kirkendall, W.C. |
|
December 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
Citation GARCIA, EULOGIA Served 12/27/2010 Returned 01/07/2011 KERN, MALORY Unserved
Judge: Kirkendall, W.C. |
|
December 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Kirkendall, W.C. |
|
December 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
Comment
Judge: Kirkendall, W.C. |
|
December 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA)
Judge: Kirkendall, W.C. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.