Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Guadalupe, County Of, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Shelburne J. Veselka, against Tres Quatro, Inc., Texas, Norwest Bank, in the jurisdiction of Guadalupe County, TX, . Guadalupe County, TX Superior Courts with Strauss, Gus J. Converted Disposition:Party: TEXAS, NORWEST BANK Disposition: *Final-Non-Jury presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 11, 1999 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationGuadalupe County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 26, 2002 | Docket Event |
Release
Judge: Strauss, Gus J. Converted Disposition:Party: TEXAS, NORWEST BANK Disposition: *Final-Non-Jury |
|
February 19, 2002 | Docket Event |
Memorandum
Judge: Strauss, Gus J. Converted Disposition:Party: TEXAS, NORWEST BANK Disposition: *Final-Non-Jury |
|
February 08, 2002 | Docket Event |
Sheriff Sale Vol./Book SCAN, Page 368179 Vol./Book SCAN, Page 368179 Judge: Strauss, Gus J. Converted Disposition:Party: TEXAS, NORWEST BANK Disposition: *Final-Non-Jury |
|
February 08, 2002 | Docket Event |
Affidavit
Judge: Strauss, Gus J. Converted Disposition:Party: TEXAS, NORWEST BANK Disposition: *Final-Non-Jury |
|
April 05, 2001 | Docket Event |
Sheriff Sale
Judge: Strauss, Gus J. Converted Disposition:Party: TEXAS, NORWEST BANK Disposition: *Final-Non-Jury |
|
April 05, 2001 | Docket Event |
Affidavit
Judge: Strauss, Gus J. Converted Disposition:Party: TEXAS, NORWEST BANK Disposition: *Final-Non-Jury |
|
January 24, 2001 | Docket Event |
Judgment Vol./Book SCAN, Page 301275 Vol./Book SCAN, Page 301275 Judge: Strauss, Gus J. Converted Disposition:Party: TEXAS, NORWEST BANK Disposition: *Final-Non-Jury |
|
November 06, 2000 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment
Judge: Strauss, Gus J. Converted Disposition:Party: TEXAS, NORWEST BANK Disposition: *Final-Non-Jury |
|
July 17, 2000 | Docket Event |
Judgment Vol./Book SCAN, Page 272668 Vol./Book SCAN, Page 272668 Judge: Strauss, Gus J. Converted Disposition:Party: TEXAS, NORWEST BANK Disposition: *Final-Non-Jury |
|
July 17, 2000 | Docket Event |
Affidavit
Judge: Strauss, Gus J. Converted Disposition:Party: TEXAS, NORWEST BANK Disposition: *Final-Non-Jury |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.