Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Guadalupe, County Of, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Shelburne J. Veselka, against Solis, Leticia, in the jurisdiction of Guadalupe County, TX, . Guadalupe County, TX Superior Courts with Strauss, Gus J. Converted Disposition:Party: SOLIS, LETICIA Disposition: *Final-Non-Jury presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 11, 1999 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationGuadalupe County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 20, 1999 | Docket Event |
Judgment Vol./Book SCAN, Page 210918 Vol./Book SCAN, Page 210918 Judge: Strauss, Gus J. Converted Disposition:Party: SOLIS, LETICIA Disposition: *Final-Non-Jury |
|
April 20, 1999 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment
Judge: Strauss, Gus J. Converted Disposition:Party: SOLIS, LETICIA Disposition: *Final-Non-Jury |
|
April 20, 1999 | Docket Event |
Comment (Judicial Officer: Strauss, Gus J. )
Judge: Strauss, Gus J. Converted Disposition:Party: SOLIS, LETICIA Disposition: *Final-Non-Jury |
|
April 12, 1999 | Docket Event |
Affidavit
Judge: Strauss, Gus J. Converted Disposition:Party: SOLIS, LETICIA Disposition: *Final-Non-Jury |
|
April 12, 1999 | Docket Event |
Notice
Judge: Strauss, Gus J. Converted Disposition:Party: SOLIS, LETICIA Disposition: *Final-Non-Jury |
|
March 02, 1999 | Docket Event |
Notice
Judge: Strauss, Gus J. Converted Disposition:Party: SOLIS, LETICIA Disposition: *Final-Non-Jury |
|
January 19, 1999 | Docket Event |
Citation
Judge: Strauss, Gus J. Converted Disposition:Party: SOLIS, LETICIA Disposition: *Final-Non-Jury |
|
January 11, 1999 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Strauss, Gus J. Converted Disposition:Party: SOLIS, LETICIA Disposition: *Final-Non-Jury |
|
January 11, 1999 | Docket Event |
Citation SOLIS, LETICIA Served 01/16/1999 Response Due 02/08/1999 Returned 01/19/1999
Judge: Strauss, Gus J. Converted Disposition:Party: SOLIS, LETICIA Disposition: *Final-Non-Jury |
|
January 11, 1999 | Docket Event |
Case Filed (OCA)
Judge: Strauss, Gus J. Converted Disposition:Party: SOLIS, LETICIA Disposition: *Final-Non-Jury |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.