Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Texas, Attorney General Of, filed a(n) General Family - Family case in the jurisdiction of Guadalupe County, TX, . Guadalupe County, TX Superior Courts with Steel, Gary Converted Disposition:Party: TEXAS, ATTORNEY GENERAL OF Disposition: *Final-Non-Jury presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 07, 1999 |
CategoryAll Other Family Matters |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGuadalupe County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 02, 2004 | Docket Event |
Request
Judge: Steel, Gary Converted Disposition:Party: TEXAS, ATTORNEY GENERAL OF Disposition: *Final-Non-Jury |
|
May 27, 1999 | Docket Event |
Employers Order to Withhold Vol./Book SCAN, Page 215514 Vol./Book SCAN, Page 215514 Judge: Steel, Gary Converted Disposition:Party: TEXAS, ATTORNEY GENERAL OF Disposition: *Final-Non-Jury |
|
March 19, 1999 | Docket Event |
Remarks
Judge: Steel, Gary Converted Disposition:Party: TEXAS, ATTORNEY GENERAL OF Disposition: *Final-Non-Jury |
|
March 16, 1999 | Docket Event |
Order Vol./Book SCAN, Page 206712 Vol./Book SCAN, Page 206712 Judge: Steel, Gary Converted Disposition:Party: TEXAS, ATTORNEY GENERAL OF Disposition: *Final-Non-Jury |
|
March 16, 1999 | Docket Event |
Comment (Judicial Officer: Steel, Gary )
Judge: Steel, Gary Converted Disposition:Party: TEXAS, ATTORNEY GENERAL OF Disposition: *Final-Non-Jury |
|
January 27, 1999 | Docket Event |
Precept
Judge: Steel, Gary Converted Disposition:Party: TEXAS, ATTORNEY GENERAL OF Disposition: *Final-Non-Jury |
|
January 27, 1999 | Docket Event |
Citation
Judge: Steel, Gary Converted Disposition:Party: TEXAS, ATTORNEY GENERAL OF Disposition: *Final-Non-Jury |
|
January 08, 1999 | Docket Event |
Precept RAVES, JOHN ADAM Served 01/21/1999 Response Due 02/15/1999 Returned 01/27/1999
Judge: Steel, Gary Converted Disposition:Party: TEXAS, ATTORNEY GENERAL OF Disposition: *Final-Non-Jury |
|
January 08, 1999 | Docket Event |
Citation RAVES, JOHN ADAM Served 01/21/1999 Response Due 02/15/1999 Returned 01/27/1999
Judge: Steel, Gary Converted Disposition:Party: TEXAS, ATTORNEY GENERAL OF Disposition: *Final-Non-Jury |
|
January 08, 1999 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Steel, Gary Converted Disposition:Party: TEXAS, ATTORNEY GENERAL OF Disposition: *Final-Non-Jury |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.