Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hamby, Kanis Hawn, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Vicki Pattillo, against Hamby, Jason K, represented by Daniel R. Strann, in the jurisdiction of Guadalupe County, TX, . Guadalupe County, TX Superior Courts with Strauss, Gus J. Converted Disposition:Party: HAMBY, JASON K Disposition: *Final-Non-Jury presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 06, 1999 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGuadalupe County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 04, 2001 | Docket Event |
Correspondence
Judge: Strauss, Gus J. Converted Disposition:Party: HAMBY, JASON K Disposition: *Final-Non-Jury |
|
August 25, 2000 | Docket Event |
Correspondence
Judge: Strauss, Gus J. Converted Disposition:Party: HAMBY, JASON K Disposition: *Final-Non-Jury |
|
August 11, 2000 | Docket Event |
Correspondence
Judge: Strauss, Gus J. Converted Disposition:Party: HAMBY, JASON K Disposition: *Final-Non-Jury |
|
June 30, 2000 | Docket Event |
Correspondence
Judge: Strauss, Gus J. Converted Disposition:Party: HAMBY, JASON K Disposition: *Final-Non-Jury |
|
February 22, 2000 | Docket Event |
Correspondence
Judge: Strauss, Gus J. Converted Disposition:Party: HAMBY, JASON K Disposition: *Final-Non-Jury |
|
June 29, 1999 | Docket Event |
Correspondence
Judge: Strauss, Gus J. Converted Disposition:Party: HAMBY, JASON K Disposition: *Final-Non-Jury |
|
May 10, 1999 | Docket Event |
Hearing-Default Divorce (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Strauss, Gus J.)
Judge: Strauss, Gus J. Converted Disposition:Party: HAMBY, JASON K Disposition: *Final-Non-Jury |
|
May 10, 1999 | Docket Event |
Employers Order to Withhold Vol./Book SCAN, Page 212992 Vol./Book SCAN, Page 212992 Judge: Strauss, Gus J. Converted Disposition:Party: HAMBY, JASON K Disposition: *Final-Non-Jury |
|
May 10, 1999 | Docket Event |
Order Vol./Book SCAN, Page 212991 Vol./Book SCAN, Page 212991 Judge: Strauss, Gus J. Converted Disposition:Party: HAMBY, JASON K Disposition: *Final-Non-Jury |
|
May 10, 1999 | Docket Event |
Decree Vol./Book SCAN, Page 212990 Vol./Book SCAN, Page 212990 Judge: Strauss, Gus J. Converted Disposition:Party: HAMBY, JASON K Disposition: *Final-Non-Jury |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.