Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hurtado, Edward S., filed a(n) General Family - Family case represented by Mike Scanio, against Hurtado, Gloria, in the jurisdiction of Guadalupe County, TX, . Guadalupe County, TX Superior Courts with Peschel, Dwight Converted Disposition:Party: HURTADO, EDWARD S. Disposition: *Dismissed-Want of Prosecution presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 04, 1999 |
CategoryAll Other Family Matters |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGuadalupe County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 01, 2000 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Docket (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Peschel, Dwight)
Judge: Peschel, Dwight Converted Disposition:Party: HURTADO, EDWARD S. Disposition: *Dismissed-Want of Prosecution |
|
June 01, 2000 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Vol./Book SCAN, Page 263893 Vol./Book SCAN, Page 263893 Judge: Peschel, Dwight Converted Disposition:Party: HURTADO, EDWARD S. Disposition: *Dismissed-Want of Prosecution |
|
June 01, 2000 | Docket Event |
Comment (Judicial Officer: Peschel, Dwight )
Judge: Peschel, Dwight Converted Disposition:Party: HURTADO, EDWARD S. Disposition: *Dismissed-Want of Prosecution |
|
April 03, 2000 | Docket Event |
Notice
Judge: Peschel, Dwight Converted Disposition:Party: HURTADO, EDWARD S. Disposition: *Dismissed-Want of Prosecution |
|
January 22, 1999 | Docket Event |
Request
Judge: Peschel, Dwight Converted Disposition:Party: HURTADO, EDWARD S. Disposition: *Dismissed-Want of Prosecution |
|
January 14, 1999 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Peschel, Dwight Converted Disposition:Party: HURTADO, EDWARD S. Disposition: *Dismissed-Want of Prosecution |
|
January 12, 1999 | Docket Event |
Motion
Judge: Peschel, Dwight Converted Disposition:Party: HURTADO, EDWARD S. Disposition: *Dismissed-Want of Prosecution |
|
January 05, 1999 | Docket Event |
Application for Protective Order
Judge: Peschel, Dwight Converted Disposition:Party: HURTADO, EDWARD S. Disposition: *Dismissed-Want of Prosecution |
|
January 05, 1999 | Docket Event |
Case Filed (OCA)
Judge: Peschel, Dwight Converted Disposition:Party: HURTADO, EDWARD S. Disposition: *Dismissed-Want of Prosecution |
|
January 04, 1999 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Peschel, Dwight Converted Disposition:Party: HURTADO, EDWARD S. Disposition: *Dismissed-Want of Prosecution |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.