Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sonitz, Paula L, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Sonitz, Michael E., in the jurisdiction of Guadalupe County, TX, . Guadalupe County, TX Superior Courts with Jones, Linda Z Converted Disposition:Party: SONITZ, MICHAEL E. Disposition: *Final-Non-Jury presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 04, 1999 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGuadalupe County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 24, 1999 | Docket Event |
Decree Vol./Book SCAN, Page 214510 Vol./Book SCAN, Page 214510 Judge: Jones, Linda Z Converted Disposition:Party: SONITZ, MICHAEL E. Disposition: *Final-Non-Jury |
|
May 24, 1999 | Docket Event |
Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Jones, Linda Z)
Judge: Jones, Linda Z Converted Disposition:Party: SONITZ, MICHAEL E. Disposition: *Final-Non-Jury |
|
May 24, 1999 | Docket Event |
Comment (Judicial Officer: Jones, Linda Z )
Judge: Jones, Linda Z Converted Disposition:Party: SONITZ, MICHAEL E. Disposition: *Final-Non-Jury |
|
March 23, 1999 | Docket Event |
Notice
Judge: Jones, Linda Z Converted Disposition:Party: SONITZ, MICHAEL E. Disposition: *Final-Non-Jury |
|
January 22, 1999 | Docket Event |
Answer
Judge: Jones, Linda Z Converted Disposition:Party: SONITZ, MICHAEL E. Disposition: *Final-Non-Jury |
|
January 04, 1999 | Docket Event |
Case Filed (OCA)
Judge: Jones, Linda Z Converted Disposition:Party: SONITZ, MICHAEL E. Disposition: *Final-Non-Jury |
|
January 04, 1999 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Jones, Linda Z Converted Disposition:Party: SONITZ, MICHAEL E. Disposition: *Final-Non-Jury |
|
January 04, 1999 | Docket Event |
Citation SONITZ, MICHAEL E. Served 01/06/1999 Response Due 02/01/1999 Returned 01/11/1999
Judge: Jones, Linda Z Converted Disposition:Party: SONITZ, MICHAEL E. Disposition: *Final-Non-Jury |
|
January 04, 1999 | Docket Event |
Affidavit
Judge: Jones, Linda Z Converted Disposition:Party: SONITZ, MICHAEL E. Disposition: *Final-Non-Jury |
|
January 04, 1999 | Docket Event |
Citation
Judge: Jones, Linda Z Converted Disposition:Party: SONITZ, MICHAEL E. Disposition: *Final-Non-Jury |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.