Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wheeler, Cheryl, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Bill Bender, against Wheeler, Billy Ray, in the jurisdiction of Guadalupe County, TX, . Guadalupe County, TX Superior Courts with Schraub, B.B Converted Disposition:Party: WHEELER, BILLY RAY Disposition: *Dismissed-Want of Prosecution presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSchraub, B.B Converted Disposition:Party: WHEELER, BILLY RAY Disposition: *Dismissed-Want of Prosecution Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 17, 1977 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGuadalupe County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 11, 1978 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Vol./Book 78-C, Page 633 Vol./Book 78-C, Page 633 Judge: Schraub, B.B Converted Disposition:Party: WHEELER, BILLY RAY Disposition: *Dismissed-Want of Prosecution |
|
December 11, 1978 | Docket Event |
Comment (Judicial Officer: Schraub, B.B )
Judge: Schraub, B.B Converted Disposition:Party: WHEELER, BILLY RAY Disposition: *Dismissed-Want of Prosecution |
|
November 06, 1978 | Docket Event |
Correspondence
Judge: Schraub, B.B Converted Disposition:Party: WHEELER, BILLY RAY Disposition: *Dismissed-Want of Prosecution |
|
May 03, 1977 | Docket Event |
Amended Petition
Judge: Schraub, B.B Converted Disposition:Party: WHEELER, BILLY RAY Disposition: *Dismissed-Want of Prosecution |
|
May 02, 1977 | Docket Event |
Answer
Judge: Schraub, B.B Converted Disposition:Party: WHEELER, BILLY RAY Disposition: *Dismissed-Want of Prosecution |
|
March 22, 1977 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Schraub, B.B Converted Disposition:Party: WHEELER, BILLY RAY Disposition: *Dismissed-Want of Prosecution |
|
March 21, 1977 | Docket Event |
Amended Motion
Judge: Schraub, B.B Converted Disposition:Party: WHEELER, BILLY RAY Disposition: *Dismissed-Want of Prosecution |
|
March 21, 1977 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Schraub, B.B Converted Disposition:Party: WHEELER, BILLY RAY Disposition: *Dismissed-Want of Prosecution |
|
March 15, 1977 | Docket Event |
Motion
Judge: Schraub, B.B Converted Disposition:Party: WHEELER, BILLY RAY Disposition: *Dismissed-Want of Prosecution |
|
February 18, 1977 | Docket Event |
Case Filed (OCA)
Judge: Schraub, B.B Converted Disposition:Party: WHEELER, BILLY RAY Disposition: *Dismissed-Want of Prosecution |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.