Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Hidden Hills Apartments Dba Maverick Gilmer, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Boyd, Deanthony, in the jurisdiction of Gregg County, TX, . Gregg County, TX Superior Courts with Bryan, Tim presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBryan, Tim Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 26, 2024 |
CategoryEvictions |
Last RefreshedFebruary 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationGregg County, TX |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
Eviction Hearing (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bryan, Tim)
Judge: Bryan, Tim |
|
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
CONSTABLE SERVICE CARD
Judge: Bryan, Tim |
|
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Eviction Citation Service BOYD, DEANTHONY Served 02/27/2024 Response Due 03/12/2024 Returned 02/27/2024
Judge: Bryan, Tim |
|
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Non-Military
Judge: Bryan, Tim |
|
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous
Judge: Bryan, Tim |
|
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
RENT AMOUNT
Judge: Bryan, Tim |
|
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
GOVERNMENT RENT AMOUNT
Judge: Bryan, Tim |
|
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Eviction Citation Service BOYD, DEANTHONY Unserved
Judge: Bryan, Tim |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.