Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Regency Park Apt Homes, filed a(n) Forcible Entry Detainer case against Gregory, Don Mark, in the jurisdiction of Gregg County, TX, . Gregg County, TX Superior Courts with Fort, Arthur L presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 02, 2004 |
CategoryForcible Entry Detainer |
Last RefreshedJanuary 26, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationGregg County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeDismissed Before Trial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 09, 2004 | Docket Event |
Conversion Event
Judge: Fort, Arthur L |
|
December 09, 2004 | Docket Event |
Trial By Judge (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Fort, Arthur L)
Judge: Fort, Arthur L |
|
December 06, 2004 | Docket Event |
Conversion Event
Judge: Fort, Arthur L |
|
December 06, 2004 | Docket Event |
Dismissal (OCA)
Judge: Fort, Arthur L |
|
December 02, 2004 | Docket Event |
Conversion Event
Judge: Fort, Arthur L |
|
December 02, 2004 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Original Petition
Judge: Fort, Arthur L |
|
December 02, 2004 | Docket Event |
Citation GREGORY, DON MARK Served 12/02/2004 Response Due 12/09/2004
Judge: Fort, Arthur L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.