Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Huntington Hills Apts, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Heard, Madison, in the jurisdiction of Gregg County, TX, . Gregg County, TX Superior Courts JP1 with Jameson, B. H. JP1 presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 03, 2024 |
CategoryEvictions |
Last RefreshedApril 06, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationGregg County, TX |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Filing Court HouseJP1 |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
Eviction Hearing (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officers Jameson, B. H. JP1, Jameson, B.H.)
Judge: Jameson, B. H. JP1 |
|
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued
Judge: Jameson, B. H. JP1 |
|
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Original Petition
Judge: Jameson, B. H. JP1 |
|
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
Eviction Citation Service HEARD, MADISON Served 04/03/2024 Response Due 04/17/2024 Returned 04/04/2024
Judge: Jameson, B. H. JP1 |
|
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
Eviction Citation Service HEARD, MADISON Unserved
Judge: Jameson, B. H. JP1 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.